Trustees THE DORCHESTER AND DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1077305

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Roy Hopwood | Chair | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jane Chappell | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Geoffrey Howes | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ann Winder | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penny Doubleday | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Myles Provis | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Eury Andrews | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Marilyn Langthorne | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jane Hopwood | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Jane Huff | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER SCAIFE | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS HUGH MAITLAND PRIDDLE | Trustee | 24 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE MOULD | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.