Financial history CLINICAL MOLECULAR GENETICS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1078518
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £54.83k £81.84k £17.46k £43.62k £7.93k
Total expenditure £48.27k £58.29k £49.71k £15.49k £2.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A