Financial history PROCLAIM TRUST

Charity number: 1076342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £79.80k £103.60k £84.01k £114.00k £101.72k
Total expenditure £109.31k £94.28k £100.24k £123.74k £127.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A