PROCLAIM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities of Proclaim Trust undertaken for the public benefit are: - Communicating the relevance of Christianity - Training churches / mentoring evangelists - Prisons ministry - Drugs education in schools - Distribution of resources to advance the message of Christianity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
57 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 July 1999: Standard registration
- 24 January 2025: Funds received from 1181131 JACOB'S WELL TRUST
- THE PROCLAIM TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rod Williams | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Clark | Trustee | 01 July 1999 |
|
|
||||
Howard Smith | Trustee | 01 July 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.80k | £103.60k | £84.01k | £114.00k | £101.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.31k | £94.28k | £100.24k | £123.74k | £127.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 05 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 JUNE 1999, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 2 OCTOBER 2000 AND 5 JULY 2006.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE PROCLAMATION OF THE WHOLE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST BOTH IN GREAT BRITAIN AND OVERSEAS AS FOUND IN THE OLD AND NEW TESTAMENTS OF THE CHRISTIAN BIBLE AND NO OTHER
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leigh Works
116a
Bradshawgate
Leigh
Greater Manchester
- Phone:
- 01706 638803
- Email:
- admin@proclaimtrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window