DR AMBEDEKAR BUDDHIST ORGANISATION BIRMINGHAM (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish Dr. Ambedkar Buddhist Centre in Birmingham To provide facilities for all religious functions To provide for and encourage the preaching and teaching of the works of Dr. Ambedkar and of the doctrines principles and practices of the Buddhist religion. To provide and or assist in the provision of education in the Buddhist traditions history language and literature. To raise funds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 10 August 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GURDEVINDER KUMAR | Chair | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Devinder Chander | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
PARMINDER SINGH | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAULTA BALI | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.35k | £14.30k | £15.17k | £15.57k | £15.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.64k | £14.24k | £38.79k | £27.89k | £14.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 May 2025 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION AS EMUNCIATED BY DR BABASAHEB AMEDEKAR IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Factory Road
BIRMINGHAM
B18 5JU
- Phone:
- 07307352819
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window