THE MADAGASCAR EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is established to advance the education of young people who normally reside in the country of Madagascar.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Madagascar
Governance
- 05 November 1999: Standard registration
- CHILDREN OF MADAGASCAR (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAOMEI WARNER | Trustee | 15 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA TURNER | Trustee | 15 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN WARNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125 | £102 | £0 | £0 | £31 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.15k | £0 | £120 | £2.32k | £46 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2024 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31ST AUGUST 1999 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14TH OCTOBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WHO ARE NORMALLY RESIDENT IN THE COUNTRY OF MADAGASCAR.
Area of benefit
MADAGASCAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Rushbrooke Close
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP13 7QN
- Phone:
- 02088616440
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window