Trustees LYTHAM IN BLOOM TRUST

Charity number: 1076465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham Holding Chair 08 May 2024
None on record
Terry Parkins Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Ted Charnley Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Wendy Parkins Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Janet Roe Trustee 08 April 2024
None on record
Carol Horridge Trustee 07 June 2023
None on record
Judith Ann Fenton Trustee 06 May 2021
FLYING MISSION LIMITED
Received: On time
John Raymond Thomas Trustee 07 August 2019
None on record
COUNCILLOR TIM ASHTON BSC (HONS) Trustee
None on record