UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE, DARLINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational and leisure activities which include the following, walking, gardening, bridge, line dancing, local history, art history, literature, creative writing. Hand bell ringing, practical art, creative writing, poetry reading, garden bowls, music appreciation, jazz appreciation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Durham
Governance
- 02 November 1999: Standard registration
- U3A DARLINGTON (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Laing | Chair | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth James Bowman | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mabel Peach | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Murton | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Keeney | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenda Nelson | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisbeth Jane Bows | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Edward Keeney | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.87k | £7.31k | £2.19k | £14.43k | £17.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.59k | £5.72k | £3.59k | £13.24k | £18.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 February 2024 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2023 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED MARCH 1996 AS AMENDED 13 JUNE 1997 AND 10 SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE-AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL TME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN DARLINGTON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. (II) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTEREST OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
DARLINGTON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Hawkesbury Mews
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL3 6RR
- Phone:
- 07703665675
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window