THE ADELE CHAPMAN FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stage various fund raising activities to enable us to continue our work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 September 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 September 1999: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 October 2009: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 April 2011: Re-registered
- 09 March 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/09/2004 | 17/09/2005 | 17/09/2008 | 17/09/2009 | 17/09/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £352 | £330 | £367 | £675 | £117 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.33k | £850 | £313 | £905 | £285 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 17 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 17 September 2010 | 15 August 2011 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 17 September 2009 | 10 April 2011 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FUNDS AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY SUPPLIED BY THE HEALTH AUTHORITY TO THE FAMILIES OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN BRITAIN SUFFERING FROM THE DISEASE COMMONLY KNOWN AS I.N.D AND THOSE UNDERGOING BOWEL OR LIVER TRANSPLANTS
Area of benefit
BRITAIN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window