TWYFORD AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are part of a national and international organisation whose aims are Fun Friendship and Fund Raising Each year we organise a fireworks display to raise funds for the local community. We also tour Twyford and the surrounding area with Father Christmas and the Santa Float throughout December.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 28 June 1999: Standard registration
- TWYFORD AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE CHARITY ACCOUNT (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neetan Kathuria | Chair | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mr C Parker | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.30k | £8.06k | £33.57k | £38.63k | £30.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.92k | £1.69k | £30.06k | £36.36k | £32.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2024 | 256 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2024 | 256 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 September 2022 | 223 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 September 2022 | 582 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES HEREBY DECLARE THAT THEY SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE SAME OR ANY PART OR PARTS THEREOF AND THE INCOME ARISING THEREFROM OR ANY PART OR PARTS THEREOF FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES, TRUSTS, ASSOCIATIONS, INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Broad Hinton
Twyford
READING
RG10 0LP
- Phone:
- 01183751357
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window