HEALING LOVE OF CHRIST MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preaching/teaching the gospel of Jesus Christ. Counselling on moral, spiritual and general problems. Healing from physical conditions and deliverance from obsessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Nigeria
Governance
- 21 February 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR CLAIRE LOUISE MOODY | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANGELA YEOMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE JANE HARGREAVES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.74k | £4.31k | £6.59k | £5.03k | £8.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.15k | £9.17k | £7.92k | £1.10k | £12.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 February 2024 | 377 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2023 | 348 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 April 2021 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 30 DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
'THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH AS HEREINAFTER DEFINED AND ADDITIONALLY THE TRUST MAY MAKE GIFTS OF UP TO 10% OF ITS INCOME TO OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Peacock Drive
Sawtry
HUNTINGDON
Cambridgeshire
PE28 5WE
- Phone:
- 07709052826
- Email:
- bridgetgjh_hjg@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window