Financial history WALES APE AND MONKEY SANCTUARY LTD

Charity number: 1076645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £287.54k £258.51k £399.88k £461.59k £451.79k
Total expenditure £281.58k £283.49k £392.00k £511.81k £470.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £60.08k N/A N/A N/A