THE BRITISH FEDERATION OF YOUTH MARCHING BAND ORGANISATIONS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Developing the Youth Marching Band activity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 February 2000: Standard registration
- 27 June 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.61k | £29.24k | £12.13k | £2.51k | £32.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.09k | £23.75k | £16.60k | £7.96k | £24.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 30 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | 30 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 25 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | 07 February 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | 06 February 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | 14 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | 14 February 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED 23 JANUARY 2000
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF MEMBERS AND LEADERS OF YOUTH MARCHING BANDS AND THE PROMOTION OF MENTAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO 25 YEARS OF AGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EXHIBITIONS, COMPETITIONS, CONCERTS OF MUSIC AND DANCE AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window