Governing document Mending Injured Minds
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/02/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/06/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/12/2011 as amended on 24 Mar 2021 as amended on 19 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
To provide appropriate support and counselling for distressed people in Nottinghamshire and the East Midlands who have had adverse sexual experiences during their childhood, or have experienced other forms of sexual violence. To provide counselling and support, including group work, to adults and young people who are suffering adverse mental health issues due to trauma and Post Traumatic Stress Disorder (PTSD). To relieve distressed people by helping them to understand and find new ways of coping with their past experiences and current difficulties, with consequent improvement to their psychological wellbeing.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND THE EAST MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.