Financial history PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION OF KATHARINE LADY BERKELEY'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1078177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.09k £4.47k £2.99k £4.52k £1.95k
Total expenditure £9.98k £1.11k £6.02k £2.89k £280
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A