PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION OF KATHARINE LADY BERKELEY'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1078177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We raise money to benefit the students & teachers of Katherine Lady Berkeley School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £1,948
Total expenditure: £280

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KLB SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION / KLB PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ciara Knight Chair 12 July 2023
None on record
Janet Elizabeth Young Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Alison Wiltshire Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.09k £4.47k £2.99k £4.52k £1.95k
Total expenditure £9.98k £1.11k £6.02k £2.89k £280
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 July 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 February 2022 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 September 2020 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Katharine Lady Berkeleys School
Kingswood
WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE
Gloucestershire
GL12 8RB
Phone:
01453 842227