THE CHALLENGE TRUST, MALACHI 3 V.10
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We give small grants to selected registered charities which further the aims and objectives of the Trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 May 1999: Standard registration
- 10 January 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE CHALLENGE TRUST (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.40k | £4.52k | £5.42k | £4.84k | £5.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.19k | £5.29k | £5.46k | £5.09k | £5.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 February 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 30TH MAY 1993
Charitable objects
TO FOR AND AMONG SUCH CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS SOCIETIES OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND AT SUCH TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THEY SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window