THE FRIENDS OF LUCKINGTON SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds for use by Luckington Community Primary School to enhance the education of pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 21 June 1999: Standard registration
- FOLS (Working name)
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Wilkinson | Chair | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Beazer | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Krista Sharp | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Marsh | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.62k | £59.34k | £10.56k | £9.44k | £10.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.33k | £21.25k | £9.53k | £13.45k | £37.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED 24 MAY 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN LUCKINGTON SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
LUCKINGTON, ALDERTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 The Bell Field
Luckington
CHIPPENHAM
Wiltshire
SN14 6GZ
- Phone:
- 07919 911654
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window