BENTLEY BEGINNINGS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children's Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Walsall
Governance
- 10 July 2000: Standard registration
- BENTLEY FAMILY CENTRE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP BRIAN JAMES POWELL | Chair |
|
||||||||
Anita Nickless | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
JAMIE ERIC CLAY | Trustee | 09 February 2015 |
|
|||||||
ROSALYN ANN HINTON | Trustee | 11 February 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.14k | £19.39k | £34.15k | £31.55k | £19.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.29k | £17.25k | £31.72k | £24.38k | £23.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 OCTOBER 1997 AS AMENDED 17 APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED 13 AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENTLEY, INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROMOTION OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH WILL DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE INHABITANTS OF BENTLEY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY
Area of benefit
BENTLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 WOLVERHAMPTON ROAD WEST
WALSALL
WS2 0BS
- Phone:
- 01922625842
- Email:
- bentley_beginnings@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window