GATWICK AVIATION MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For awareness of National Aviation History. Maintain & display historic aircraft & engines, classic aircraft & associated memorabilia & provide practical workshop on the development and progress of aviation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laurence James Berryman | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary John Ramsdale | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Buchanan Aitchison | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Milton Roach | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HELGE SCRASE | Trustee | 31 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/05/2020 | 30/05/2021 | 30/05/2022 | 30/05/2023 | 30/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.03k | £84.92k | £49.22k | £101.65k | £217.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.21k | £47.22k | £81.94k | £104.43k | £216.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.82k | £3.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2022 | 18 May 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2022 | 18 May 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2021 | 03 May 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2021 | 03 May 2022 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH JANUARY 1999 as amended on 27 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AN EDUCATIONAL CENTRE FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC (IN PARTICULAR STUDENTS AND SCHOOL CHILDREN) IN THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND FOR AWARENESS OF NATIONAL AVIATION HISTORY. THIS IS TO BE ACHIEVED BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A WORKING AVIATION MUSEUM TO RESTORE, PRESERVE, MAINTAIN AND DISPLAY HISTORIC AND CLASSIC AIRCRAFT AND ASSOCIATED MEMORABILIA TO THE PUBLIC AND TO PROVIDE A VENUE FOR LECTURES, SEMINARS AND PRACTICAL WORKSHOPS ON AVIATION HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
VALLANCE BY WAYS
LOWFIELD HEATH ROAD
CHARLWOOD
SURREY
RH6 0BT
- Phone:
- 01293 862294
- Email:
- hello@gamc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window