Financial history MID, WEST AND SOUTH WALES FIRE ENGINE PRESERVATION GROUP

Charity number: 1107081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £900 £900 £500 £800 £2.92k
Total expenditure £1.55k £876 £896 £936 £946
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A