Financial history IMMANUEL PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, CAERAU

Charity number: 1080182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £106.44k £101.53k £110.83k £115.68k £170.56k
Total expenditure £83.03k £76.44k £90.22k £114.62k £126.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A