OAK BANK FAMILY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a professional, confidential, non- judgemental counselling service enabling a personal informed choice about an unplanned pregnancy. To provide specialist counselling and support following abortion, still birth or miscarriage. To provide practical support during pregnancy. To facilitate education and discussion in schools and colleges on relationships and pregnancy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- West Berkshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 28 October 1999: Standard registration
- 06 October 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- OAK BANK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.37k | £5.80k | £2.39k | £179 | £188 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.28k | £3.84k | £3.88k | £4.37k | £2.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 02 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 14 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 07 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 27 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 19 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
A/ THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF PREGNANCY AND THE TERMINATION OF PREGNANCY AND INTO THE EFFECTS THEREOF UPON WOMEN WHETHER PHYSICAL, MEDICAL OR PSYCHOLOGICAL. B/ THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF WOMEN'S HEALTH C/THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND ASSISTANCE TO WOMEN AND THEIR PARTNERS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS, DISTRESS OR POVERTY DURING OR AS A RESULT OF PREGNANCY OR FOLLOWING AN ABORTION, MISCARRIAGE, COT DEATH, STILL BIRTH, LOSS OF A CHILD OR SEXUAL ABUSE. D/ THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH MAY CONVENIENTLY BE CARRIED ON IN CONNECTION WITH THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE ANDOVER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window