ADD/ADHD PARENT SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Army Assault courses and Sport days
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 19 May 1999: Standard registration
- 20 April 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2004 | 28/02/2007 | 29/02/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.85k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.11k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
1.PROVIDING SUPPORT AND GUIDANCE TO PARENTS WHOSE CHILDREN ARE DIAGNOSED AS SUFFERING FROM ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER AND ITS ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS. 2.RELIEF OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION.3. ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATED TO ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER. 4. PROMOTING SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
WEST YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window