Accounts and annual returns CUDDLY KOALAS BROUGHTON MOOR PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1076134
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 November 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 November 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 31 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2017 On Time