Financial history THE MIDSOMER NORTON AND DISTRICT CARNIVAL CHARITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1078139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £32.13k £12.01k £12.01k £29.00k £20.84k
Total expenditure £26.17k £10.90k £10.90k £20.00k £22.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £3.00k £4.00k £10.00k £8.00k