Accounts and annual returns ' CHALLENGER DISABLED SAILING GROUP'
Charity number: 1077307
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 07 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2009 | 23 March 2010 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2008 | 29 January 2009 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2007 | 29 January 2009 | 455 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 11 November 2008 | 377 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window