MAXTED TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide relief of suffering To promote the Christian Faith Support Christians
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- South Africa
- Zambia
Governance
- 12 October 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DAVID FLEMING MAXTED | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr ANDREW PETER MAXTED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW GRAHAM GENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRINA REBECCA GENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JENNIE BARROW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.35k | £17.45k | £17.57k | £16.20k | £19.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.89k | £15.55k | £17.04k | £16.50k | £20.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEN FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS. 1) TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF SUFFERING 2) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 GREEN LANE
HUCCLECOTE
GLOUCESTER
GL3 3QX
- Phone:
- 01452372282
- Email:
- dpmaxted@blueyonder.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window