Trustees THE LANCASHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMENS INSTITUTES

Charity number: 1076283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Halliwell Trustee 20 February 2025
None on record
Louise Aplin Trustee 20 February 2025
None on record
Julie McAulay Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Emma Elizabeth Gillinder Trustee 13 April 2024
None on record
Alice Rose Marquis-Carr Trustee 13 April 2024
None on record
Patricia Ellen Forder Trustee 11 March 2020
None on record
Heather Williams Trustee 12 March 2016
None on record
Ruth Louisa Grimley Trustee 18 June 2015
RAINHILL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity reporting is overdue by 286 days