CAMBRIDGE HANDEL OPERA GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The education of the public in the art and practice of the music of George Frederic Handel, by means of staged productions of Handel's operas and other activities to promote a greater understanding and appreciation of Handel's music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 17 May 1999: Standard registration
- 29 July 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- C H O G (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.90k | £9.79k | £47.80k | £12.74k | £31.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.33k | £2.03k | £49.76k | £8.37k | £75.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 20 March 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | 29 April 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 13 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | 13 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | 24 October 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 14TH SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
(1) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND PRACTICE OF THE MUSIC OF GEORGE FRIDERIC HANDEL, BY MEANS OF STAGE PRODUCTIONS OF HANDEL'S OPERAS; (11) SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES TO PROMOTE THE GREATER UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF HANDEL'S MUSIC AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window