STAR (STUDENT ACTION FOR REFUGEES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
STAR is a national charity building a society where refugees are welcomed & can thrive. We do this by building a movement of welcome, empowering young people to be changemakers; providing local support to refugees through community projects; challenging the structural barriers people face seeking protection and building new lives; sharing information to shift the narrative.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 January 2000: Standard registration
- STAR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Hannah Bonnett | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Max Altaras | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Matthew Peter Grenier | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Christine Bacon | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Maryam Taher | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
JAMES OSBORNE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225.16k | £177.48k | £226.11k | £223.67k | £172.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £257.54k | £216.45k | £176.56k | £181.31k | £198.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £11.89k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4TH JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 21 NOVEMBER 2010 as amended on 18 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, HARDSHIP, POVERTY AND DISTRESS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF A TRAINED STUDENT NETWORK OF VOLUNTEERS AND HELPERS TO ASSIST IN ALL ASPECTS OF REFUGEE ASSISTANCE (11) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THE ROLE OF STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Warner Wilde Ltd
4 Marigold Drive
Bisley
WOKING
Surrey
GU24 9SF
- Phone:
- 07783335058
- Email:
- info@star-network.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window