Trustees LEIGHTON LINSLADE U3A
Charity Number: 1075910

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERYL KEMPLEN | Chair | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Kemplen | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Putman | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Taylor | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Foster | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Richardson | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lorna richardson | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Vieyra | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeanie Kathleen Harman | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN LOWES | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.