Financial history WORLD WIDE WELFARE (WWW)

Charity Number: 1079336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £109.55k £175.26k £93.89k £97.93k £158.24k
Total expenditure £121.51k £216.16k £81.37k £67.20k £137.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A