Accounts and annual returns COLBY COLLEGE (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1076811
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2008 22 April 2009 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2008 09 March 2009 70 days late