Trustees BCPC

Charity Number: 1075620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Francis Ames Trustee 10 January 2025
None on record
Jill Shearer Trustee 25 November 2023
None on record
John Barrett Trustee 05 December 2022
None on record
Martin Lee Gledhill Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Frankie McGibney Trustee 14 April 2018
None on record