VICTIM SUPPORT LANCASHIRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides victims of crime, witnesses in court and their friends and families with appropriate and sufficient recognition, support and information to assist them in dealing with the crimes they have experienced. Ensures that all rights of victims and witnesses are acknowledged and advanced by working in partnership with others in the criminal justice system.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2008
Total income:
£1,146,697
Donations and legacies | £86.27k | |
Charitable activities | £1.02m | |
Other trading activities | £36.67k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £3.16k |
Total expenditure:
£1,118,998
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.10m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £21.13k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.10m | |
Retained for future use | £27.70k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 November 1999: Standard registration
- 27 November 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 27 November 2009: Funds transferred to 298028 VICTIM SUPPORT
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 30/06/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £969.85k | £983.65k | £1.00m | £965.44k | £1.15m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00m | £1.05m | £1.04m | £1.02m | £1.12m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £78.96k | £86.27k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £35.16k | £36.67k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £849.16k | £1.02m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.17k | £3.16k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.49k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00m | £1.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.71k | £8.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 30/06/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.84k | £10.89k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £45.57k | £54.64k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £32.14k | £65.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 08 May 2009 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | 30 April 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 28 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 30 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 30 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 01 February 2006 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 10 February 2006 | 10 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
A. TO RELIEVE DISTRESS, POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE VICTIMS OR WITNESSES OF CRIME AND PERSONS AFFECTED BY CRIME WITHIN LANCASHIRE INCLUDING THE FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED. B. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND AWARENESS BY RESEARCH INTO ISSUES RELATING TO THE VICTIMS AND WITNESSES OF CRIME AND THEIR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. C. TO RELIEVE DISTRESS, POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS WITHIN LANCASHIRE WHO HAVE SUFFERED THE SAME AS A RESULT OF CIVIL DISASTER OR SIMILAR INCIDENT OR SITUATION, INCLUDING ROAD TRAFFIC ACCIDENTS, BUT NOT AMOUNTING TO A CRIME, AND THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
WITHIN LANCASHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window