JAMIA HANFIA GHOSIA MOSQUE AND PRINCESS STREET RESOURCE CENTRE


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has published a report Open in new window on its inquiry into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTION OF ISLAMIC RELIGION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 26 January 2000: Standard registration
- BURTON MUSLIM MOSQUE (Working name)
- PRINCESS STREET MOSQUE AND CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAJID RAJA ALI | Chair | 10 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Latif | Trustee | 29 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ahsam Latif | Trustee | 29 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Younas | Trustee | 29 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tahir Yaqoob | Trustee | 29 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yasir Thathall | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Ismail | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Junaid | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Haseeb Tajmal | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Ehsan ulhaq | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Qamar Zaman | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.58k | £89.62k | £202.04k | £155.63k | £175.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.19k | £62.64k | £179.54k | £107.78k | £165.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 February 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 February 2022 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
06 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED 12 SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 22 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BURTON UPON TRENT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM RELIGION, ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BURTON UPON TRENT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
19-24 Princess Street
BURTON-ON-TRENT
Staffordshire
DE14 2NW
- Phone:
- 07794407770
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window