DAVENPORT ROAD EVANGELICAL CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our core activity is proclaiming the gospel with church services; meetings and activities for children and young people. We interact with the local school and the community. We support young peoples camps. welfare counselling, a weekly drop-in cafe and provide food for those in need. Giving to disaster relief - earthquake, famine and flood. Our area is one of the poorer ones of Derby
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 October 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward James Neat | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|||||
MR R CRESSWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR N JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.58k | £119.38k | £107.49k | £112.71k | £116.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.00k | £103.48k | £108.39k | £101.83k | £105.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN DERBY AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN DERBY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN DERBY SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
DERBY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 KINGS DRIVE
LITTLEOVER
DERBY
DE23 6EU
- Phone:
- 01332340880
- Email:
- nigel.jones6@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window