ST DAVID'S COLLEGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To benefit the public by providing a first class education for children,independent of the state system.For our pupils, we aim to develope the whole person through a general education in the best and wisest sense, with a wide choice of interest and activity, and an appreciation of moral and spiritual values,leading to a lifelong desire to contribute to the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£7,057,121
Donations and legacies | £10.03k | |
Charitable activities | £6.97m | |
Other trading activities | £78.48k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,673,048
Raising funds | £39.96k | |
Charitable activities | £6.63m | |
Other | £0 |
£5,402 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £39.96k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.63m | |
Retained for future use | £384.07k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £39.96k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.63m | |
Retained for future use | £389.48k |
People

142 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Conwy
Governance
- 27 May 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Moore | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Williams | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Underhill | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Aubert | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael Hadley | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Leake | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY MUELLER | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
RIGHT REVD KEITH SINCLAIR | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alice Seldon | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT KENWELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev PETER JOHN GASKELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.43m | £5.56m | £6.20m | £6.28m | £7.05m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.57m | £5.45m | £6.02m | £6.39m | £6.67m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.08m | £1.10m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £217.71k | £105.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £1.20k | £0 | £500 | £10.03k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £77.84k | £78.48k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.42m | £5.56m | £6.19m | £6.20m | £6.97m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.13k | £2.57k | £2.03k | £666 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.47m | £5.44m | £6.01m | £6.37m | £6.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £99.81k | £9.62k | £10.07k | £10.46k | £39.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £22.16k | £28.43k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.07m | £3.09m | £3.12m | £3.23m | £3.08m | |
|
Long-term investments | £118.17k | £130.85k | £114.47k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £778.79k | £1.02m | £1.21m | £1.59m | £3.78m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.32m | £1.46m | £1.51m | £1.99m | £3.65m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 FEBRUARY 1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 JUNE 1999, 5 MARCH 2002, 21 JUNE 2005 AND 20 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
A. TO ACQUIRE AND TAKE OVER THE UNDERTAKING OF THE SCHOOL KNOWN AS ST DAVID'S COLLEGE (ESTABLISHED BY A DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH NOVEMBER 1965 MADE BY ERNEST BAMBER & OTHERS) AND TO DEVELOP THE SAME AS AN EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND GIRLS B. TO ACQUIRE AND CARRY ON IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY OTHER SCHOOLS OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Davids College
Gloddaeth
LLANDUDNO
LL30 1RD
- Phone:
- 01492876702
- Email:
- bursar@stdavidscollege.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window