Financial history DIGARTREF CYF

Charity number: 1076680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.20m £1.20m £1.30m £1.35m £1.44m
Total expenditure £1.13m £1.15m £1.14m £1.30m £1.42m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £773.75k £813.39k £909.36k £962.66k £1.35m
Income - Donations and legacies £26.03k £13.83k £12.32k £17.74k £7.85k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £53.12k £65.83k
Income - Charitable activities £1.17m £1.19m £1.28m £1.28m £1.35m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.23k £444 £58 £1.44k £9.60k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.13m £1.15m £1.14m £1.30m £1.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.02k £5.77k £4.71k £6.07k £5.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0