ETHELBURGA FAMILY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Full Day Care for children aged 6 months to five years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 12 August 1999: Standard registration
- ETHELBURGA EARLY YEARS CENTRE (Working name)
- ETHELBURGA FAMILY CENTRE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sherrill Ann Fitkin | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
ROBINA KHALID | Trustee | 17 December 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £229.65k | £232.50k | £263.49k | £317.88k | £332.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.37k | £229.86k | £263.74k | £318.20k | £358.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £32.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £35.07k | £965 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 March 2025 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 March 2025 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2025 | 419 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2025 | 419 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ALL CHILDREN BELOW THE AGE OF ELEVEN YEARS BY: (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART AND (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Blakenham Road
Tooting
LONDON
SW17 8NE
- Phone:
- 02079243005
- Website:
-
Ethelburgaearlyyears@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window