ALL SAINTS LEIGHTON BUZZARD PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise and manage funds for the preservation, repair, maintenance, restoration, improvement and ornamentation of the Parish Church of All Saints Leighton Buzzard and its churchyard, boundary walls, and gates.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 27 August 1999: Standard registration
- ALL SAINTS PRESERVATION TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Edwards | Chair | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev David John Lamont MacGeoch | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Steven Robert Lakin | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Rebecca Bradley | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Booth | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ELIZABETH KERR | Trustee | 19 February 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.18k | £19.27k | £15.16k | £44.36k | £11.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.00k | £8.95k | £8.53k | £10.70k | £29.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST MAY 1999 AND AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 4TH AUGUST 1999
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AND OF ALL CONTRIBUTIONS AND SUBSCRIPTIONS FROM TIME TO TIME RECEIVED BY THEM FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY AS HEREINAFTER MENTIONED UPON TRUST TO APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE APPLIED THE SAME AT SUCH TIME AND IN SUCH MANNER AND UPON SUCH TERMS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE FOR THE PRESERVATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE RESTORATION IMPROVEMENT AND ORNAMENTATION OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS LEIGHTON BUZZARD AFORESAID
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LEIGHTON BUZZARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 High Street
LEIGHTON BUZZARD
LU7 1EA
- Phone:
- 01525372512
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window