ROCHFORD COMMUNITY CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rochford Community Church Trust's main activity is that of a Christian Church meeting in the town of Rochford, Essex. It is also significantly involved in community activities in the area using the working name of Rochford Community Projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,435 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 04 February 2011: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY CHURCH ROCHFORD (Working name)
- NUMBER ONE (ROCHFORD SHOP) (Working name)
- ROCHFORD COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- ROCHFORD COMMUNITY PROJECTS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristoffer Goring | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Everett | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Phyllis Thorn | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hilary Liberty | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Maxwell | Trustee | 30 December 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.07k | £111.31k | £135.18k | £110.23k | £106.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.23k | £112.84k | £131.08k | £115.60k | £116.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £5.00k | £3.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/05/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/10/2012
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY ( HEREIN CALLED THE TRUSTEES) MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID COUNTY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE SAID COUNTY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT D) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE SAID COUNTY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
ESSEX AND ELSEWHERE IN UK
Linked charities
- 04 February 2011 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
93 Golden Cross Road
ROCHFORD
Essex
SS4 3DH
- Phone:
- 07833475253
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window