SHARPE'S POTTERY HERITAGE AND ARTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide museum collections open to the public. Provide a base for local community groups Provide opportunities for volunteering Provide opportunities for people to research local history
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £83,714 from 2 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 19 August 1999: Standard registration
- SHARPES POTTERY MUSEUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter William Tunnicliffe | Chair | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Muldoon | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helena Smith Parucker | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hampton | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JOHN WROUGHTON | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Christopher James Beech | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.59k | £233.62k | £119.55k | £130.78k | £152.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.79k | £222.39k | £187.49k | £157.68k | £152.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £68.71k | £53.15k | £83.71k | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 188 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 AUGUST 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 15 APRIL 2009. as amended on 29 Sep 2020 as amended on 07 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
The principle object of the Company is to advance the education of the public in all matters relating to the arts, crafts, cultural and industrial heritage of South Derbyshire for the benefit of the community, clients and stakeholders in particular but not exclusively, by the provision of a Museum, Pottery, Heritage & Arts Centre.
Area of benefit
SOUTH DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHARPE'S POTTERY MUSEUM
WEST STREET
SWADLINCOTE
DERBYSHIRE
DE11 9DG
- Phone:
- 01283 222600
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window