Governing document SHARPE'S POTTERY HERITAGE AND ARTS TRUST LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 AUGUST 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 15 APRIL 2009. as amended on 29 Sep 2020 as amended on 07 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
The principle object of the Company is to advance the education of the public in all matters relating to the arts, crafts, cultural and industrial heritage of South Derbyshire for the benefit of the community, clients and stakeholders in particular but not exclusively, by the provision of a Museum, Pottery, Heritage & Arts Centre.
Area of benefit
SOUTH DERBYSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.