DEFFORD MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides & maintains a "village green" for the benefit of local people and visitors to Defford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 16 July 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Defford & Besford Parish Council | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/06/2020 | 10/06/2021 | 10/06/2022 | 10/06/2023 | 10/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 June 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 June 2023 | 21 April 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 June 2022 | 16 April 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 June 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/04/1999 AS AMENDED ON 01/02/2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM TO THE PROVISION OF THE PROPERTY AND SHALL ACCORDINGLY HOLD ANY PROPERTY TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS "DEFFORD MILLENNIUM GREEN" FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT WITH THESE TRUSTS AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF DEFFORD CUM BESFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Abbey Road
PERSHORE
Worcestershire
WR10 1JP
- Phone:
- 01386 552233
- Website:
-
defford-besfordparishcouncil.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window