FRIENDS OF ADI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of ADI provides, at the discretion of the trustees, financial and other assistance to Alzheimers Disease International (ADI), the worldwide federation of Alzheimer associations. ADI works to build and strengthen Alzheimer associations around the world and to raise awareness of dementia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 11 August 1999: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ALZHEIMERS DISEASE INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW TERENCE KETTERINGHAM | Chair | 04 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Prof Graeme Julian Samuel AC | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Leonard Arnold | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|||||
David Alan Troxel | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR NORI GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.88k | £11.83k | £3.35k | £1.21k | £55.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.68k | £11.75k | £203 | £97 | £52.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH MAY 1999
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ALZHEIMERS DISEASE AND RELATED CONDITIONS IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE FOR THE CARERS OF SUCH PERSONS THROUGH THE PROVISION, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES, OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO THE BODY CALLED "ALZHEIMERS DISEASE INTERNATIONAL: THE INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION OF ALZHEIMERS AND RELATED DEMENTIA SOCIETIES INCORPORATED"( WHICH BODY IS COMMONLY KNOWN AS "ADI" AND IS INCORPORATED IN THE STATE OF ILLINOIS IN THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Blue Lion Place
London
SE1 4PU
- Phone:
- 02079810880
- Email:
- info@alz.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window