R.G. KAR MEDICAL COLLEGE APPEAL FUND (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) Details are in newsletter and in website. b) We help four medical students who are economically disadvantaged to study medicine, with scholorships. c) We encourage medical and nursing students to do audits. d) We help them with books & journals. e) We are trying to develop positive health of students by immunisation programme against hip B, prevent waterbourne disease by providing purified wate
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 12 November 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ATINDRANATH SIKDAR | Chair | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr DULAL KUMAR BANERJEE | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Barun Kumar Dutta | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr SWAPNA GHOSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANJALI SIKDAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULA SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TORUNIMA DAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SIPRA BANERJEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SHRAMANA MITUL BANERJEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.70k | £3.71k | £2.20k | £2.29k | £2.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.05k | £200 | £2.56k | £5.06k | £1.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AND POSTGRADUATE STUDENTS OF ALL MEDICAL DISCIPLINES OF R G.KAR MEDICAL COLLEGE, CALCUTTA INDIA; AND (2) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF DISEASES PREVALENT IN THE INDIAN SUB-CONTINENT AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Falstaff Close
NUNEATON
Warwickshire
CV11 6FB
- Phone:
- 01978291112
- Email:
- dkban2005@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window