JESUS DOMINION INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1077406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of Christian religion and education through the promotion of the Christian Faith.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £32,311
Total expenditure: £13,107

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden
  • City Of Westminster
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • JESUS ARENA INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TINA AKINOLA Trustee
None on record
MARTIN GRAHAM STONE Trustee
None on record
ANTONIA OKIEMUTE SAKPERE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.67k £20.60k £27.93k £29.68k £32.31k
Total expenditure £10.86k £4.51k £5.41k £6.16k £13.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 February 2024 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 February 2024 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 February 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 February 2023 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 February 2022 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 February 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 March 2021 33 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Box 402
Mill Hill House
6 The Broadway
Mill Hill
NW7 3LL
Phone:
02086522450
Website:

No information available