GREYHOUND WELFARE AND RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We look after, assess and find new, loving homes, for greyhounds in need of care in Wales and The Marches. We provide vet treatment and kennelling and work in co operation with other like-minded Welsh groups to ensure that families offering suitable homes are not kept waiting. Our fundraising Activities are promoted on ... http://www.greyhoundsinwales.moonfruit.com.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Blaenau Gwent
- Bridgend
- Bristol City
- Caerphilly
- Cardiff
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
Governance
- 09 September 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER EDWARD HARRISON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rowan Elizabeth Wilson | Trustee | 14 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAULA KATHERINE PREECE AMBROSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNA CLAIRE ELIZABETH DURRAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENI DURRAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN JULIA HODSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA SUSAN HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.00k | £10.57k | £5.70k | £4.89k | £4.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.09k | £11.65k | £5.73k | £3.73k | £3.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 15 June 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 25 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED 27 AUGUST 1999
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF GREYHOUNDS WHO HAVE BEEN ABANDONED AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND TO PLACE THEM IN SUCH PERMANENT HOMES AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
58B RISCA ROAD
ROGERSTONE
NEWPORT
NP10 9FZ
- Phone:
- 01633892846
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window